Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ante Jozić

Apostolic Nuncio to Belarus

Titular Archbishop of Cissa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1967 Born
15 Dec 199124.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Split-Makarska, Croatia
28 Jun 199225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Split-Makarska, Croatia
2 Feb 201952.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Côte d’Ivoire
2 Feb 201952.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cissa
Oct 2019²52.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Other
21 May 202053.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belarus
16 Sep 202053.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cissa

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ante Jozić
Archbishop Ante Jozić (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Belarus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrilj, Diocese of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
Ordained BishopSveta Obitelj, Church, Solin, Archdiocese of Split-Makarska, Croatia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Belarus.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2019
  • ~ob: CB, 27 Apr 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 May 2020
  • ob: CB, 14 Aug 2020
  • c2: CB, 30 Aug 2020
  • c4: CB, 16 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast