Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pavao Žanić

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1918Born
1 Jun 194123.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 197052.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
9 Dec 197052.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Edistiana
2 May 197152.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Edistiana
14 Sep 198062.3SucceededBishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
24 Jul 199375.1RetiredBishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
11 Jan 200081.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Pavao Žanić (VIAF: 40187658)
Bishop Pavao Žanić (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaštel Novi
Ordained BishopSts. Peter and Paul, Church, Mostar, Diocese of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan)

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 857

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Feb 2021

Quantcast