Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ranko Vidović

Bishop-Elect of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1961 Born
29 Jun 198625.1Ordained PriestPriest of Split-Makarska, Croatia
4 Mar 202159.8AppointedBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
22 May 202160.0Ordained BishopBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Ranko Vidović
Father Ranko Vidović (born ) Bishop-Elect of Hvar (-Brac e Vis)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVidonje, Diocese of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)
Ordained PriestGospe od Zdravlja, Church, Split, Archdiocese of Split-Makarska
Ordained BishopSveti Stjepana I, Pape i Mučenika, Cathedral, Hvar, Diocese of Hvar (-Brac e Vis)

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Hvar (-Brac e Vis).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2021
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Apr 2021

Quantcast