Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Larry James Kulick

Bishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1966 Born
16 May 199226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
15 Sep 202054.5AppointedAdministrator of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
18 Dec 202054.8AppointedBishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
11 Feb 202154.9Ordained BishopBishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Larry James Kulick
Bishop Larry James Kulick (born ) Bishop of Greensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNatrona Heights, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopBlessed Sacrament, Cathedral, Greensburg, Diocese of Greensburg, Pennsylvania

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Greensburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Dec 2020
  • mn/ob/c2: CB, 18 Dec 2020
  • c34: CB, 13 Jan 2021
  • admi: AM, 25 Jan 2021
  • c1: CB, 4 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Feb 2021

Quantcast