Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nelson Jesus Perez

Archbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1961 Born
20 May 198927.9Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Jun 201250.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
8 Jun 201250.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Catrum
25 Jul 201251.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Catrum
11 Jul 201756.0AppointedBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
5 Sep 201756.2InstalledBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
23 Jan 202058.6AppointedArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
18 Feb 202058.6InstalledArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Nelson Jesus Perez
Archbishop Nelson Jesus Perez (born ) Archbishop of Philadelphia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMiami, FL, Diocese of Miami, Florida
Ordained PriestSaints Peter and Paul, Cathedral Basilica, Philadelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSaint Agnes, Cathedral, Rockville Centre, Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Philadelphia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2: Website of the Diocese, 8 Jun 2012
  • c34: CB, 25 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,509
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2017
  • i: CB, 11 Jul 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Jan 2020
  • i: CB, 23 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 26 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jan 2021

Quantcast