Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Cecchini

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Austria

Titular Archbishop of Aquileia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1920Born
2 Jul 194424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lucca, Italy
26 Feb 196948.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aquileia
26 Feb 196948.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Madagascar
1 Mar 196948.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Mauritius
13 Apr 196949.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Aquileia
18 Jun 197656.2AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Yugoslavia
4 Dec 198464.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
26 Apr 198969.1DiedApostolic Nuncio to Austria

MicroData Summary for Michele Cecchini (VIAF: 311439785)
Archbishop Michele Cecchini (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Austria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLammari, Archdiocese of Lucca, Italy
Ordained BishopSaint-Martin, Cathedral, Lucca, Archdiocese of Lucca, Italy

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 2, Number 55
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 490
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1989, Page 737
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 22 Nov 2020

Quantcast