Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Weber

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Graz-Seckau, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1927Born
2 Jul 195023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Seckau, Austria
10 Jun 196942.1AppointedBishop of Graz-Seckau, Austria
28 Sep 196942.4Ordained BishopBishop of Graz-Seckau, Austria
14 Mar 200173.8RetiredBishop of Graz-Seckau, Austria
23 May 202093.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Graz-Seckau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johann Weber (VIAF: 15575227)
Bishop Johann Weber (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Graz-Seckau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGraz, Diocese of Seckau
Ordained BishopCathedral, Graz, Diocese of Graz-Seckau
Death PlaceLKH University, Hospital, Graz, Diocese of Graz-Seckau

  • a priest for 69.8 years
  • a bishop for 50.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 259
  • d: CB, 23 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast