Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jožef Smej

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Maribor, Slovenia

Titular Bishop of Tzernicus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1922Born
8 Dec 194422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Maribor, Slovenia
15 Apr 198361.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Maribor, Slovenia
15 Apr 198361.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tzernicus
23 May 198361.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tzernicus
18 Jun 200987.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Maribor, Slovenia
21 Nov 202098.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Maribor, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Jožef Smej
Bishop Jožef Smej (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Maribor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogojina
Ordained BishopSt. John the Baptist, Cathedral, Maribor, Diocese of Maribor
Death PlaceLenart

  • a priest for 75.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,737
  • d: CB, 22 Nov 2020
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Feb 2021

Quantcast