Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Heinrich Döring (Doëring), S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Poona, India

Titular Archbishop of Anazarbus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1859Born
21 Dec 188223.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
7 Sep 190747.9AppointedBishop of Poona, India
8 Dec 190748.2Ordained BishopBishop of Poona, India
16 Jun 192161.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Madytus
4 May 192363.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hiroshima, Japan
14 Jul 192767.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Poona, India
15 Jan 194888.3RetiredBishop of Poona, India
15 Jan 194888.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus
17 Dec 195192.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Poona, India

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Döring (Doëring)
Archbishop Heinrich Döring (Doëring) S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Poona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBocholt, Germany
Ordained BishopPoona, Diocese of Poona

  • a priest for 68.9 years
  • a bishop for 44.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1907, Number 69
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 4,019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast