Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Carlo Perini, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Calicut, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1867Born
1897¹29.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
17 Aug 191043.5AppointedBishop of Mangalore, India
4 Dec 191043.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mangalore, India
12 Jun 192356.4AppointedBishop of Calicut, India
28 Jun 193265.4DiedBishop of Calicut, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Carlo Perini
Bishop Paolo Carlo Perini S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Calicut

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrandola, Italy
Ordained BishopMangalore, Diocese of Mangalore

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1910, Number 77
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,926

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast