Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Joseph Marie Jacolin, M.D.P.

Bishop of Luçon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1950 Born
4 Apr 198231.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bourges, France
4 Aug 198434.2ProfessedPriest of Other
30 Sep 198737.4Perpetual VowsPriest of Other
16 Jan 200756.7AppointedBishop of Mende, France
18 Mar 200756.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
29 May 201868.0AppointedBishop of Luçon, France
15 Jul 201868.2InstalledBishop of Luçon, France

MicroData Summary for François Joseph Marie Jacolin (VIAF: 193978053)
Bishop François Joseph Marie Jacolin M.D.P. (born ) Bishop of Luçon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFontainebleau
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mende, Diocese of Mende

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Luçon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,350
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 May 2018
  • i: CB, 15 Jul 2018
  • prof/perp: CB, 31 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast