Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Charles Féron

Deceased

Bishop of Clermont, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1794³Born
14 Feb 181823.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 183338.9SelectedBishop of Clermont, France
20 Jan 183439.1ConfirmedBishop of Clermont, France
16 Mar 183439.3Ordained BishopBishop of Clermont, France
15 Apr 183439.3InstalledBishop of Clermont, France
24 Dec 187985.0DiedBishop of Clermont, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Charles Féron (VIAF: 54142333)
Bishop Louis-Charles Féron (born , died ) Bishop of Clermont

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Grégoire-du-Vièvre

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 153
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 11
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 298, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 429, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 551, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast