Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Alfred Grimardias

Deceased

Bishop of Cahors, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1814Born
23 Dec 183723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Clermont, France
6 Jan 186651.2SelectedBishop of Cahors, France
22 Jun 186651.7ConfirmedBishop of Cahors, France
6 Aug 186651.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
27 May 189681.6DiedBishop of Cahors, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Alfred Grimardias (VIAF: 313311904)
Bishop Pierre-Alfred Grimardias (born , died ) Bishop of Cahors

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaringues
Ordained BishopCathedral, Clermont, Diocese of Clermont

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 23
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 298, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 429, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 551, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast