Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benjamin Christiaens, O.F.M. Rec. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Meridionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Colophon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1844Born
14 Oct 186521.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Recollect
6 Jun 186824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Recollect
13 Feb 188944.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Meridionale}, China
13 Feb 188944.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Colophon
12 May 188945.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Colophon
1899¹54.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Meridionale}, China
7 Jan 193186.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Meridionale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benjamin Christiaens
Bishop Benjamin Christiaens O.F.M. Rec. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThielt, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
Ordained BishopPro-Cathedral, Hangchow
Death PlaceGent, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: LC
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 216
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 27
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 28 Dec 2019
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 929

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast