Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Hemrom

Bishop of Dibrugarh, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1969 Born
25 Apr 199930.1Ordained PriestPriest of Dibrugarh, India
2 Dec 201849.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Dibrugarh, India
24 Feb 201949.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Dibrugarh, India
15 Feb 202151.9SucceededBishop of Dibrugarh, India

MicroData Summary for Albert Hemrom
Bishop Albert Hemrom (born ) Bishop of Dibrugarh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKonapathar, Diocese of Dibrugarh
Ordained PriestPhilobari
Ordained BishopGrounds of the Bishop's House, Dibrugarh, Diocese of Dibrugarh

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dibrugarh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2018
  • ob: CB, 2 Dec 2018
  • ob/c2+: CB, 16 Feb 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,104
  • s: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Feb 2021

Quantcast