Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Sueo Hamaguchi

Deceased

Bishop of Oita, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1948Born
19 Mar 197526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Nagasaki, Japan
200556.4IncardinatedPriest of Takamatsu, Japan
25 Mar 201162.6AppointedBishop of Oita, Japan
26 Jun 201162.9Ordained BishopBishop of Oita, Japan
28 Dec 202072.4DiedBishop of Oita, Japan

MicroData Summary for Paul Sueo Hamaguchi
Bishop Paul Sueo Hamaguchi (born , died ) Bishop of Oita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHigashi Shutsu
Ordained BishopBeacon Plaza International Convention Centre, Beppu
Death PlaceUniversity, Hospital, Oita, Diocese of Oita

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,082
  • d: CB, 28 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 29 Dec 2020

Quantcast