Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gábor Pintér

Apostolic Nuncio to Honduras

Titular Archbishop of Velebusdus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1964 Born
11 Jun 198824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Vác, Hungary
13 May 201652.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belarus
13 May 201652.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Velebusdus
15 Jul 201652.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Velebusdus
12 Nov 201955.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Honduras

MicroData Summary for Gábor Pintér
Archbishop Gábor Pintér (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Honduras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKunszentmarton
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vac, Diocese of Vác, Hungary

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Honduras.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,061
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Jun 2021

Quantcast