Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio González Sánchez

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Victoria, Tamaulipas, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1947 Born
10 Jun 197325.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Nov 199548.1AppointedBishop of Ciudad Victoria, Tamaulipas, México
14 Dec 199548.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Victoria, Tamaulipas, México
30 Mar 202173.5ResignedBishop of Ciudad Victoria, Tamaulipas, México

MicroData Summary for Antonio González Sánchez
Bishop Antonio González Sánchez (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Victoria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmatlán de Jora
Ordained BishopGimnasio Multidisciplinar Universitario, Ciudad Victoria, Diocese of Ciudad Victoria, Tamaulipas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciudad Victoria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,673
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 Mar 2021

Quantcast