Catholic-Hierarchy DC

William Cardinal Godfrey

Deceased

Archbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo

Apostolic Exarch of England and Wales {Inghilterra e Galles} (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1889Born
28 Oct 191627.0Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
21 Nov 193849.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cius
21 Nov 193849.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Great Britain
21 Dec 193849.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cius
194353.2AppointedOfficial to Poland
10 Nov 195364.1AppointedArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
3 Dec 195667.1AppointedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
11 Feb 195767.3InstalledArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
10 Jun 195767.7AppointedApostolic Exarch of England and Wales {Inghilterra e Galles} (Ukrainian), Great Britain
15 Dec 195869.2Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 195869.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
22 Jan 196373.3DiedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Godfrey (VIAF: 280888271)
William Cardinal Godfrey (born , died ) Archbishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeven Street, Kirkdale, Liverpool, Lancashire, Diocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained PriestVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopEnglish, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceArchbishop's House, Ambrosden Avenue, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Most Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
  • a cardinal for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 103
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 99, and Page 100
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 265, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 428, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 527, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,018, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,127, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast