Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Edward Flynn

Deceased

Bishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1880Born
13 Jun 190828.4Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
12 Jun 193959.4AppointedBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
24 Jul 193959.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
4 Nov 196181.8DiedBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Edward Flynn (VIAF: 75847157)
Bishop Thomas Edward Flynn (born , died ) Bishop of Lancaster

EventPlace
Birth PlacePortsmouth, Hampshire, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph, Seminary, Upholland, Skelmersdale, Lancashire, Diocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Lancaster, Lancashire, Diocese of Lancaster, England
Death PlaceRoyal Infirmary, Hospital, Preston, Lancashire, Diocese of Lancaster, England
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, St. Peter, Cathedral, Lancaster, Lancashire, Diocese of Lancaster, England

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1939, Number 33
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 92
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018
  • 22.loc: CL, 5 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Mar 2021

Quantcast