Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Zanin

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Argentina

Titular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1890Born
3 Jul 191323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
28 Nov 193343.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
28 Nov 193343.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to China
7 Jan 193443.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
7 Jan 193443.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Harbin [Harbin], China
194655.7AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
21 Mar 194756.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile
7 Feb 195362.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Argentina
4 Aug 195868.3DiedApostolic Nuncio to Argentina

MicroData Summary for Mario Zanin (VIAF: 89480909)
Archbishop Mario Zanin (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Argentina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFeltre, Diocese of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1934, Number 4
  • opd: CB, 10 Apr 2017
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 43, and Page 90, and Page 91
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,107, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast