Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Romolo Carboni

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Italy

Titular Archbishop of Sidon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1911Born
31 Mar 193422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Fano, Italy
28 Sep 195342.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sidon
28 Sep 195342.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Australia, New Zealand and Oceania
25 Oct 195342.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sidon
2 Sep 195948.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Peru
26 Apr 196957.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Italy
19 Apr 198674.9RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Italy
2 Sep 199988.3DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Italy

MicroData Summary for Romolo Carboni
Archbishop Romolo Carboni (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Italy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFano

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 45.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 647, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast