Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Maurice Faivre

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1934Born
29 Jun 196025.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
29 Apr 199257.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
29 Apr 199257.7AppointedTitular Bishop of San Leone
14 Jun 199257.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of San Leone
29 Jul 199762.9AppointedBishop of Le Mans, France
3 Jul 200873.8ResignedBishop of Le Mans, France
13 Aug 201076.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Maurice Faivre
Bishop Jacques Maurice Faivre (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)
Ordained PriestSaint-Jean, Cathedral, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)
Ordained BishopSaint-Jean, Cathedral, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2008
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,683
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • opd/c1: AJ, 29 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Aug 2021

Quantcast