Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcel Damphousse

Archbishop of Ottawa-Cornwall, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1963 Born
28 Jun 199128.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
28 Jun 201249.2AppointedBishop of Alexandria-Cornwall, Ontario, Canada
2 Sep 201249.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alexandria-Cornwall, Ontario, Canada
12 Nov 201552.6AppointedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
6 May 202057.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Ottawa-Cornwall, Ontario, Canada
16 Jun 202057.2InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Ottawa-Cornwall, Ontario, Canada
4 Dec 202057.7SucceededArchbishop of Ottawa-Cornwall, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Marcel Damphousse
Archbishop Marcel Damphousse (born ) Archbishop of Ottawa-Cornwall

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Joseph
Ordained BishopSaint Finnan, Cathedral, Alexandria, Diocese of Alexandria-Cornwall, Ontario

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ottawa-Cornwall.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2012
  • ob: CB, 9 Jul 2012
  • c2+: CB, 19 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,531
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 May 2020
  • i: CB, 9 Jun 2020
  • s: Bollettino, 4 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 4 Dec 2020

Quantcast