Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Brendan Michael O’Brien

Archbishop Emeritus of Kingston, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1943 Born
1 Jun 196824.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
6 May 198743.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
6 May 198743.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Numana
29 Jun 198743.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Numana
5 May 199349.6AppointedBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
29 Jun 199349.7InstalledBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
4 Dec 200057.1AppointedArchbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
1 Jun 200763.6AppointedArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
25 Jul 200763.8InstalledArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
28 Mar 201975.5RetiredArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Brendan Michael O’Brien (VIAF: 105034002)
Archbishop Brendan Michael O’Brien (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kingston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOttawa, Archdiocese of Ottawa, Ontario
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral Basilica, Ottawa, Archdiocese of Ottawa, Ontario

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kingston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,151
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 4 Dec 2020

Quantcast