Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eugenio Cardinal Dal Corso, P.S.D.P.

Bishop Emeritus of Benguela, Angola

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1939 Born
8 Sep 195920.3First VowsMember of Poveri Servi della Divina Provvidenza
7 Jul 196324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Poveri Servi della Divina Provvidenza
15 Dec 199556.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saurimo, Angola
3 Mar 199656.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Saurimo, Angola
15 Jan 199757.6SucceededBishop of Saurimo, Angola
18 Feb 200868.7AppointedBishop of Benguela, Angola
26 Mar 201878.8RetiredBishop of Benguela, Angola
5 Oct 201980.3Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 201980.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
17 Nov 201980.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Dal Corso (VIAF: 89583708)
Eugenio Cardinal Dal Corso P.S.D.P. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Benguela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLugo di Valpantena di Grezzana, Diocese of Verona, Italy
Ordained PriestCasa di Nazareth, Verona, Diocese of Verona, Italy
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Obra da Divina Providência, Hospital, Luanda, Archdiocese of Luanda

Please contact the Cardinal through the Diocese of Benguela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,692
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Mar 2018
  • card: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2019
  • cpri: Bollettino, 5 Oct 2019
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Oct 2019
  • i: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast