Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedito Domingos Vito Coscia, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jataí, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1922Born
11 Jun 194926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
8 Jun 196138.8AppointedBishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil
21 Sep 196139.1Ordained BishopBishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil
24 Feb 199976.5RetiredBishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil
30 Apr 200885.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Jataí, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Benedito Domingos Vito Coscia
Bishop Benedito Domingos Vito Coscia O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jataí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooklyn, NY, USA

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 46.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,091, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast