Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornélio Chizzini, F.D.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tocantinópolis, Tocatins, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1914Born
15 Aug 193217.7First VowsMember of Sons of Divine Providence
16 Jun 194025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of Divine Providence
2 Feb 196045.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tocantinópolis, Tocatins, Brazil
12 Apr 196247.4AppointedPrelate of Tocantinópolis, Tocatins, Brazil
12 Apr 196247.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aegae
29 Jun 196247.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aegae
26 May 197863.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Aegae
5 Mar 198166.3AppointedBishop of Tocantinópolis, Tocatins, Brazil
12 Aug 198166.7DiedBishop of Tocantinópolis, Tocatins, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Cornélio Chizzini
Bishop Cornélio Chizzini F.D.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Tocantinópolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasalsigone, Diocese of Cremona, Italy
Death PlaceGoiania

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast