Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Capistrano Francisco (William Charles) Heim, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Itaituba, Para, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1934Born
15 Jul 196026.4First VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
22 Aug 196329.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
18 Dec 196531.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
6 Jul 198854.4AppointedPrelate of Itaituba, Para, Brazil
17 Sep 198854.6Ordained BishopPrelate of Itaituba, Para, Brazil
8 Dec 201076.8RetiredPrelate of Itaituba, Para, Brazil
24 Sep 202086.6DiedPrelate Emeritus of Itaituba, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Capistrano Francisco (William Charles) Heim
Bishop Capistrano Francisco (William Charles) Heim O.F.M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Itaituba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatskill, Diocese of Albany, New York, USA
Ordained BishopSant'Ana, Church, Anapolis
Death PlaceTeresian House, Albany, Diocese of Albany, New York, USA
Buried Place (Original)St. Agnes, Cemetery, Menands, Diocese of Albany, New York, USA

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,919

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast