Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-August Chorin, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bangkok, Thailand

Titular Bishop of Polystylus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1888Born
29 Sep 191224.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
10 Jul 194758.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bangkok, Thailand
10 Jul 194758.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Polystylus
5 Oct 194759.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Polystylus
29 Apr 196576.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Bangkok, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Louis-August Chorin
Bishop Louis-August Chorin M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bangkok

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlençon, France

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 101
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 371, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast