Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Chan

Deceased

Bishop of Penang, Malaysia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1913Born
4 Dec 193926.3Ordained PriestPriest of Malacca, Singapore
25 Feb 195541.5AppointedBishop of Penang, Malaysia
28 Aug 195542.0Ordained BishopBishop of Penang, Malaysia
20 Oct 196754.2DiedBishop of Penang, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Francis Chan
Bishop Francis Chan (born , died ) Bishop of Penang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSingapore, Diocese of Malacca, Singapore
Ordained BishopGood Shepherd, Cathedral, Singapore, Archdiocese of Malacca-Singapore
Death PlaceResidence, Macalister Road, Penang, Diocese of Penang
Buried Place (Original)Western Road, Cemetery, George Town, Penang, Diocese of Penang

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1955, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast