Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jožef Kvas

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ljubljana, Slovenia

Titular Bishop of Calama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1919Born
5 Jun 194525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana, Slovenia
13 May 198363.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
13 May 198363.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Calama
12 Jun 198363.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calama
13 Nov 199980.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
29 Dec 200586.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ljubljana, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Jožef Kvas
Bishop Jožef Kvas (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ljubljana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerklje na Gorenjskem
Ordained BishopSt. Nicolas, Cathedral, Ljubljana, Archdiocese of Ljubljana

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,738

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast