Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Xavier Tabao Manjarimanana, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mananjary, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1927Born
29 Jun 196032.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
20 Nov 197547.9AppointedBishop of Mananjary, Madagascar
21 Mar 197648.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mananjary, Madagascar
24 May 199971.4DiedBishop of Mananjary, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for François Xavier Tabao Manjarimanana
Bishop François Xavier Tabao Manjarimanana S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Mananjary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnkatafana
Ordained BishopSt. Augustin, Cathedral, Mananjary, Diocese of Mananjary

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 37, Number 2,231

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast