Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nolly Camingue Buco

Auxiliary Bishop of Antipolo, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Gemellae in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1963 Born
25 Mar 199329.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Antipolo, Philippines
18 Oct 199329.8Ordained PriestPriest of Antipolo, Philippines
10 Jul 201854.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antipolo, Philippines
10 Jul 201854.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Byzacena
8 Sep 201854.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Byzacena

MicroData Summary for Nolly Camingue Buco
Bishop Nolly Camingue Buco (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Antipolo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaganga, Davao Oriental
Ordained BishopCathedral, Antipolo, Diocese of Antipolo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Antipolo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2018
  • mn: CB, 10 Jul 2018
  • ob: CB, 15 Jul 2018
  • c2+: CB, 15 Aug 2018
  • od/c01: CB, 7 Sep 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,847
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast