Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Auguste-Marie Boussard

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vannes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1917Born
28 Sep 194730.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
29 Sep 194730.2Ordained PriestPriest of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
24 Sep 196447.2AppointedBishop of Vannes, France
1 Feb 196547.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
16 Nov 199174.3RetiredBishop of Vannes, France
18 Oct 199780.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Vannes, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Auguste-Marie Boussard
Bishop Pierre-Auguste-Marie Boussard (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vannes

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlogonnec, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained DeaconMajor Seminary, Chapel, Quimper, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained PriestSaint-Corentin, Cathedral, Quimper, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained BishopSaint-Pierre, Cathedral, Vannes, Diocese of Vannes
Death PlacePlonévez-Porzay, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Pierre, Cathedral, Vannes, Diocese of Vannes

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast