Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Jean-Marie Serrand

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1874Born
27 May 189924.4Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 192348.4AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
6 Aug 192348.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
13 Aug 192348.6InstalledBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
20 Mar 194974.2DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France

MicroData Summary for François-Jean-Marie Serrand (VIAF: 2604294)
Bishop François-Jean-Marie Serrand (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBillé

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1923, Number 44
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 425, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 848, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast