Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alexis-Armand Cardinal Charost

Deceased

Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1860Born
19 May 188322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Le Mans, France
14 Feb 191352.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France
14 Feb 191352.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
13 May 191352.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
21 Nov 191353.0AppointedBishop of Lille, France
18 Jun 192059.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
18 Jun 192059.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chersonesus in Zechia
22 Sep 192160.8SucceededArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
11 Dec 192262.0Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 192262.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria
7 Nov 193069.9DiedArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

MicroData Summary for Alexis-Armand Charost
Alexis-Armand Cardinal Charost (born , died ) Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Mans

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
  • a cardinal for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1913, Number 23
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 425, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 848, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast