Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John William Campling, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}, Uganda

Titular Bishop of Comana Pontica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1873Born
1 May 190329.6Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
6 Aug 192349.9AppointedPrefect of Buéa, Cameroon
13 May 192551.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}, Uganda
13 May 192551.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Pontica
24 Aug 192551.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Comana Pontica
Feb 1938³64.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}, Uganda
23 Sep 196188.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}, Uganda

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John William Campling
Bishop John William Campling M.H.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePartick, Glasgow, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1925, Number 46
  • loc: CL, 23 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast