Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Marie Régis Belzile, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Moundou, Chad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1931Born
1953²21.8EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
11 Feb 196129.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
19 Dec 197443.7AppointedBishop of Moundou, Chad
6 Apr 197544.0Ordained BishopBishop of Moundou, Chad
9 Mar 198553.9ResignedBishop of Moundou, Chad
4 Sep 201887.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Moundou, Chad

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Marie Régis Belzile
Bishop Joseph Marie Régis Belzile O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Moundou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmqui, Canada
Ordained BishopMoundou, Diocese of Moundou
Death PlaceMontréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec, Canada
Buried Place (Original)Mausolée des Capucins, Montréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec, Canada

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 12 Sep 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,730

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast