Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel (Régis) Balet, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Moundou, Chad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1930Born
11 Sep 195121.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Jun 195525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Mar 198555.0AppointedBishop of Moundou, Chad
12 May 198555.2Ordained BishopBishop of Moundou, Chad
19 Sep 198959.6DiedBishop of Moundou, Chad

MicroData Summary for Gabriel (Régis) Balet
Bishop Gabriel (Régis) Balet O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Moundou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrimisuat
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Moundou, Diocese of Moundou

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,834

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast