Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mark Andrew Bartosic

Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

Titular Bishop of Naratcata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1961 Born
21 May 199432.9Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
3 Jul 201857.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
3 Jul 201857.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Naratcata
17 Sep 201857.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Naratcata

MicroData Summary for Mark Andrew Bartosic
Bishop Mark Andrew Bartosic (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeenah, Diocese of Green Bay, Wisconsin
Ordained PriestHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Chicago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 Jul 2018
  • c34: CB, 20 Aug 2018
  • mn: CB, 25 Aug 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,851

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast