Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Esmeraldo Barreto de Farias, Ist. del Prado

Bishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1949 Born
9 Jan 197727.5Ordained PriestPriest of Istituto del Prado
22 Mar 200050.7AppointedBishop of Paulo Afonso, Bahia, Brazil
11 Jun 200050.9Ordained BishopBishop of Paulo Afonso, Bahia, Brazil
28 Feb 200757.6AppointedBishop of Santarém, Para, Brazil
30 Nov 201162.4AppointedArchbishop of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil
18 Mar 201565.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
18 Mar 201565.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Summula
18 Nov 202071.3AppointedBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
6 Feb 202171.5InstalledBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Esmeraldo Barreto de Farias
Bishop Esmeraldo Barreto de Farias Ist. del Prado (born ) Bishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanto Antônio de Jesus
Ordained BishopSão Benedito, Church, Santo Antônio de Jesus

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Araçuaí (Arassuaí).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2007
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,782
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2020
  • i: CB, 18 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Feb 2021

Quantcast