Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José de Medeiros Delgado

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1905Born
2 Jun 192923.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 194135.6AppointedBishop of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
29 Jun 194135.9Ordained BishopBishop of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
4 Sep 195146.1AppointedArchbishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
10 May 196357.7AppointedArchbishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
26 Mar 197367.6ResignedArchbishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
9 Mar 198882.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José de Medeiros Delgado (VIAF: 33573257)
Archbishop José de Medeiros Delgado (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Fortaleza

EventPlace
Birth PlacePombal

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 46.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1941, Number 37
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 603
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,014, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast