Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André de Witte

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa), Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1944Born
6 Jul 196823.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 199449.4AppointedBishop of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa), Bahia, Brazil
28 Aug 199449.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa), Bahia, Brazil
15 Apr 202075.2RetiredBishop of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa), Bahia, Brazil
25 Apr 202176.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa), Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for André de Witte
Bishop André de Witte (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScheldewindeke
Ordained BishopDivino Espírito Santo, Church, Inhambupe, Diocese of Alagoinhas, Bahia
Death PlaceSão Salvador da Bahia, Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,432
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2020
  • d: CB, 26 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast