Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Banga Bane

Bishop of Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1957 Born
15 Aug 198326.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 199538.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
11 Apr 199638.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
27 Sep 199639.3SucceededBishop of Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Joseph Banga Bane (VIAF: 195151246587744132197)
Bishop Joseph Banga Bane (born ) Bishop of Buta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMiala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Buta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,835

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast