Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Tshomba Yungu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tshumbe, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1928Born
20 Dec 195729.3Ordained PriestPriest of Tshumbe, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Apr 196839.6AppointedBishop of Tshumbe, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
15 Sep 196840.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tshumbe, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
22 Jul 199566.9ResignedBishop of Tshumbe, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Jan 199768.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Tshumbe, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Albert Tshomba Yungu (VIAF: 68060364)
Bishop Albert Tshomba Yungu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tshumbe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLodja
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lodja

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 2, Number 61
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast