Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léonard Dhejju

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bunia, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1931Born
23 Aug 195928.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bunia, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Mar 198150.0AppointedBishop of Uvira, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
19 Jul 198150.3Ordained BishopBishop of Uvira, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
2 Jul 198453.3AppointedBishop of Bunia, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 Apr 200271.0ResignedBishop of Bunia, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
4 Jun 201988.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Bunia, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Léonard Dhejju
Bishop Léonard Dhejju (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bunia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDele
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Church, Uvira, Diocese of Uvira
Death PlaceBunia, Diocese of Bunia

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,844

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast