Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Kananga

Archidioecesis Kanangana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kasaï Superiore
18 March 1904ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Belgian Congo {Congo Belga} o Indipendente Prefecture Apostolic of Kasaï Superiore (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kasaï Superiore
13 June 1917ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kasaï Superiore Vicariate Apostolic of Kasaï Superiore
18 July 1922Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kasaï Superiore
Prefecture Apostolic of Katanga
Prefecture Apostolic of Lulua e Katanga Centrale (erected)
25 May 1936Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kasaï Superiore Prefecture Apostolic of Tshumbe (erected)
13 April 1937Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kasaï Superiore
Vicariate Apostolic of Koango o Kwango
Prefecture Apostolic of Ipamu (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Luluabourg
10 March 1949Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kasaï Superiore Vicariate Apostolic of Luluabourg
24 March 1953Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Luluabourg Vicariate Apostolic of Kabinda (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Mweka (erected)
25 April 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Luluabourg Vicariate Apostolic of Luebo (erected)
Archdiocese of Luluabourg
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Luluabourg Archdiocese of Luluabourg
1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Luluabourg Apostolic Administration of Mbuji-Mayi (erected)
3 May 1966Territory LostArchdiocese of Luluabourg
Apostolic Administration of Mbuji-Mayi
Diocese of Mbujimayi
26 September 1967Territory LostArchdiocese of Luluabourg Diocese of Luiza (erected)
Archdiocese of Kananga
14 June 1972Name ChangedArchdiocese of Luluabourg Archdiocese of Kananga

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Luluabourg
1950386,5581,500,00025.8%261551812,13548225ap1951
Archdiocese of Luluabourg
1970526,5201,059,94349.7%81741822,89221421513ap1971
Archdiocese of Kananga
1980578,0001,186,00048.7%2365886,5689217016ap1981
1990726,0001,453,00050.0%83421255,8088723522ap1991
19991,001,0002,001,00050.0%98271258,0087227648ap2000
20001,250,0002,100,00059.5%105251309,6157728048ap2001
20011,320,0002,200,00060.0%1032612910,2327628649ap2002
20021,320,0002,200,00060.0%981811611,3795625651ap2003
20031,331,0002,200,00060.5%952311811,2795921251ap2004
20041,335,0002,200,00060.7%932411711,4106226253ap2005
20061,397,0002,320,00060.2%983112910,8297429354ap2007
20111,895,0002,769,00068.4%1364718310,3559551062ap2012
20132,001,0002,924,00068.4%1474319010,53111354164ap2014
20162,160,0003,156,00068.4%1533719011,36810557370ap2017
20192,373,0003,979,00059.6%1593719612,10710557370ap2020

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast