Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Arellano Fernández, M.C.C.I.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Esmeraldas, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Cellae in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1944 Born
18 Dec 197228.0Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
1 Jun 199550.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Esmeraldas, Ecuador
1 Jun 199550.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cellae in Proconsulari
20 Aug 199550.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cellae in Proconsulari
5 Jul 202176.6RetiredVicar Apostolic of Esmeraldas, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Arellano Fernández
Bishop Eugenio Arellano Fernández M.C.C.I. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Esmeraldas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorella, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Esmeraldas, Vicariate Apostolic of Esmeraldas

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Esmeraldas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,602
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Jul 2021

Quantcast