Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Canalini

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Switzerland

Titular Archbishop of Valeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1936 Born
18 Mar 196124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
28 May 198650.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Valeria
28 May 198650.1AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Indonesia
12 Jul 198650.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Valeria
20 Jul 199155.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ecuador
3 Dec 199862.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Australia
8 Sep 200468.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
8 Sep 200468.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Liechtenstein
Apr 2011²75.0RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
Apr 2011²75.0RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Liechtenstein

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Canalini
Archbishop Francesco Canalini (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Switzerland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOsimo, Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. John the Baptist, Cathedral, Osimo, Archdiocese of Ancona-Osimo, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Switzerland.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 98, Number 8,456

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 May 2021

Quantcast